EP1892619 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND COMMAND EXECUTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSHI, Noritaka NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06746620.1 | 18.05.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006JP309952 | Priority number, date | JP20050153427 | 26.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005153427 | [2008/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006126449 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892619 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/30, G06F17/16 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
G06F9/30032 (EP,US);
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
G06F9/30038 (EP,US);
G06F9/30181 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (EP,US);
G06F9/384 (EP,US);
G06F7/764 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/10] |
Former [2008/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND BEFEHLSAUSFÜHRUNGSVERFAHREN | [2008/09] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND COMMAND EXECUTION METHOD | [2008/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET MÉTHODE D'EXÉCUTION DE COMMANDE | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2007 | Translation filed | 05.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2009 | 31.05.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5131086 (CIRCELLO JOSEPH C [US], et al); | [A]US5867724 (MCMAHON RONALD S [US]) |