EP1890187 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-Chome, Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKABE, Masato, c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | 02 /
SAWATARI, Naoko, c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | 03 /
HAMA, Hideo, c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO. LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1628001 / JP | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06746626.8 | 18.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006JP309959 | Priority number, date | JP20050147327 | 19.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005147327 | [2008/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006123749 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890187 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337, C09K19/02, C09K19/38, G02F1/133, G02F1/141 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
G02F1/141 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/0225 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/10 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/2007 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3852 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1337 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | FR [2008/28] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLDISPLAYELEMENT | [2008/08] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENT | [2008/08] | French: | ELEMENT D'AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2007 | Translation filed | 18.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 20.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2012 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 30.04.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 18.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 18.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002085153 (CHOI SUK WON [KR], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [E]EP1715372 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XP] - OKABE M ET AL, "23.3: A Novel Mono-Domain Alignment Method for Ferroelectric Liquid Crystal Applying to Half-V Shape Mode Field Sequential Color Displays", 2005 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM. BOSTON, MA, MAY 24 - 27, 2005; [SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM], SAN JOSE, CA : SID, US, (20050524), vol. XXXVI, pages 1084 - 1087, XP007012241 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document * |