EP1890061 - SEALING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15 Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANZAKI, Go c/o NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi Fukushima 9601102 / JP | 02 /
MATSUI, Hiroki NOK CORPORATION 8, Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 9601102 / JP | 03 /
KOBAYASHI, Naoto NOK CORPORATION 8 Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi Fukushima 9601102 / JP | 04 /
YAMANAKA, Satoshi NOK CORP. 8 Aza Tsuzukibori Nagaigawa Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 9601102 / JP | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06746779.5 | 24.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006JP310296 | Priority number, date | JP20050166729 | 07.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005166729 | JP20050166730 | 07.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005166730 | [2008/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006132083 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890061 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/447, F16C33/78, F16C33/80, F16J15/32 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
F16C33/7883 (EP,US);
F16J15/447 (KR);
F16C33/78 (KR);
F16C33/80 (EP,KR,US);
F16J15/32 (KR);
F16J15/3264 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/27] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/08] | English: | SEALING DEVICE | [2008/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D ETANCHEITE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2007 | Translation filed | 29.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 08.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |