EP1903677 - BOUNDARY ACOUSTIC WAVE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBAHARA, Teruhisa, MURATA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
NAKAHASHI, Norihiko, MURATA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
KANDO, Hajime, MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06746844.7 | 25.05.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006JP310465 | Priority number, date | JP20050204757 | 13.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005204757 | [2008/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007476 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903677 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/64, H03H9/145, H03H9/25 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
H03H9/0222 (EP,US);
H03H9/145 (KR);
H03H9/02559 (EP,US);
H03H9/25 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAND-AKUSTIKWELLENFILTER | [2008/13] | English: | BOUNDARY ACOUSTIC WAVE FILTER | [2008/13] | French: | FILTRE À ONDE ACOUSTIQUE D INTERFACE | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2007 | Translation filed | 22.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/33] | 07.07.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2011 | 15.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004048283 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0025] *; | [Y]WO2005060094 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * . *; | EP1696562 [ ] (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0021] , [0028] , [0029] , [0033] , [0034] , [0040] , [0133]; figures 1a,b,46; table 1 *; | [A] - KISELEV S V ET AL, "SAW FILTERS WITH COMBINED SINGLE-MODE AND DOUBLE-MODE SECTIONS", PROC. ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM 2002, (20021011), vol. 1, pages 179 - 183, XP001189318 [A] 1-4 * abstract, Introduction; figure 2a * |