EP1887256 - AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION DEVICE FOR WHEEL LOADER, AND WHEEL LOADER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KCM Corporation 2680, Oka, Inami-cho Kako-gun Hyogo 675-1113 / JP | [2016/44] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-1, Kouraku 2-chome Bunkyou-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states TCM Corporation 15-5, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd 5-1, Kouraku 2-chome, Bunkyou-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Tetsuji, @c/o TCM CORPORATION 15-5, Nishi-Simbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105003 / JP | 02 /
HIGAKI, Masami, @c/o TCM CORPORATION 15-5, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105003 / JP | 03 /
OUCHI, Hirofumi, @c/o TCM CORPORATION 15-5, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105003 / JP | 04 /
SAKAI, Eiichi, @c/o TCM CORPORATION 15-5, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105003 / JP | [2018/14] |
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
TANAKA, Tetsuji, c/o TCM CORPORATION 15-5, Nishi-Simbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105003 / JP | ||
02 /
HIGAKI, Masami, c/o TCM CORPORATION 15-5, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105003 / JP | |||
03 /
OUCHI, Hirofumi, c/o TCM CORPORATION 15-5, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105003 / JP | |||
04 /
SAKAI, Eiichi, c/o TCM CORPORATION 15-5, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105003 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2018/14] |
Former [2008/07] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06747080.7 | 01.06.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006JP310978 | Priority number, date | JP20050164123 | 03.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005164123 | [2008/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006129748 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887256 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887256 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00, E02F3/34, E02F9/22, F16H59/18, F16H59/46, F16H59/50, F16H61/02 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
E02F9/2037 (EP,US);
F16H61/00 (KR);
E02F3/34 (EP,KR,US);
F16H59/18 (KR);
F16H59/46 (KR);
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
F16H59/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/07] | F16H61/00, E02F3/34, E02F9/22, F16H59/18, F16H59/46, F16H59/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2018/14] |
Former [2008/27] | DE, NL | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATIKGETRIEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR RADLADER UND RADLADER | [2008/07] | English: | AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION DEVICE FOR WHEEL LOADER, AND WHEEL LOADER | [2008/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION AUTOMATIQUE POUR CHARGEUSE A PNEUS ET CHARGEUSE A PNEUS | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2007 | Translation filed | 07.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 04.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 04.04.2018 | [2018/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4800660 (MASAO FUKUDA [JP]) [X] 1,12,13 * column 1, line 4 - column 28; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-8 [I] 9,10; | [XI]JPH0634029 (FURUKAWA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,12,13 * abstract * [I] 3,5,6; | [A]US6199450 (CARLSON DOUGLAS A [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5305657 (BRAY STEVEN C [US], et al) [A] 1,9-13 * the whole document * |