EP1886004 - ELECTROMAGNETICALLY DRIVEN VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 4718571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 4718571 / JP | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Kiyoharu TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 4718571 / JP | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Kopp, Stephan, et al Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Kopp, Stephan, et al KUHNEN & WACKER, Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06747144.1 | 29.05.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006JP311164 | Priority number, date | JP20050161609 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005161609 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006129831 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886004 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886004 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/04, F16K31/06 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
F16K31/0679 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F16K31/0682 (EP,US);
F01L2009/2109 (EP);
F01L2009/2136 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/26] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCH ANGESTEUERTES VENTIL | [2008/07] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETICALLY DRIVEN VALVE | [2008/07] | French: | VANNE A COMMANDE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 03.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.06.2009 | [2010/26] |