EP1890965 - STRUCTURE, POROUS BODY, SENSOR, PROCESS OF STRUCTURE AND DETECTING METHOD FOR SPECIMEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURATA, Yusuke, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Weser, Thilo, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Weser, Thilo, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06747229.0 | 01.06.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006JP311469 | Priority number, date | JP20050166754 | 07.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005166754 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006132294 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890965 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890965 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/193, C01B37/00, C12Q1/00, G01N33/487 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
C01B33/193 (KR);
C01B37/00 (KR);
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
C12Q1/00 (KR);
G01N33/487 (KR);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRUKTUR, PORÖSER KÖRPER, SENSOR, STRUKTURVERFAHREN UND NACHWEISMETHODE FÜR PROBEN | [2008/09] | English: | STRUCTURE, POROUS BODY, SENSOR, PROCESS OF STRUCTURE AND DETECTING METHOD FOR SPECIMEN | [2008/09] | French: | STRUCTURE, CORPS POREUX, CAPTEUR, PREPARATION DE CETTE STRUCTURE, ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE COMPOSANT | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2010 | BE | 21.07.2010 | CY | 21.07.2010 | CZ | 21.07.2010 | DK | 21.07.2010 | EE | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | IT | 21.07.2010 | LT | 21.07.2010 | LV | 21.07.2010 | NL | 21.07.2010 | PL | 21.07.2010 | RO | 21.07.2010 | SE | 21.07.2010 | SI | 21.07.2010 | SK | 21.07.2010 | TR | 21.07.2010 | BG | 21.10.2010 | GR | 22.10.2010 | ES | 01.11.2010 | IS | 21.11.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
TR | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
RO | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
LV | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
IS | 21.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
LT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 |