04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
15.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
27.05.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
06.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |
08.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
01.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
28.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] |
18.06.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
10.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.08.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
01.08.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.03.2008 |
First examination report |
|
20.03.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
25.01.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
16.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|