EP2021232 - A VALVE UNIT FOR A REBREATHER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radikal AS Serviceboks 5 6025 Alesund / NO | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Frimann, Lars Erik Velliveien 21 1358 Jar / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frimann, Lars erik Velliveien 21 1358 Jar / NO | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Heggstad, Jon Dagson Bryn Aarflot AS Stortingsgata 8 0161 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Heggstad, Jon Dagson Bryn Aarflot AS P.O. Box 449 Sentrum 0104 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 06747628.3 | 28.04.2006 | [2009/07] | WO2006NO00161 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007126317 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2021232 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63C11/18, B63C11/24, A61M16/00, A62B9/06 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
B63C11/186 (EP,US);
A62B9/06 (EP,US);
A62B19/00 (EP,US);
B63C11/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | 26.11.2008 | BA | 26.11.2008 | HR | 26.11.2008 | MK | 26.11.2008 | YU | 26.11.2008 | Title | German: | VENTILEINHEIT FÜR EIN KREISLAUFTAUCHGERÄT | [2009/07] | English: | A VALVE UNIT FOR A REBREATHER APPARATUS | [2009/07] | French: | UNITE DE SOUPAPE POUR RESPIRATEUR A RECIRCULATION | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 18.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2010 | 30.04.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2012 | 30.04.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5127398 (STONE WILLIAM C [US]); | [A]US5746199 (BAYRON HARRY [US], et al); | [A]US6681766 (MATSUOKA MITSUSHIRO [JP]); | [A]US2002157669 (CHEN FRANKIE [TW]) | by applicant | US5127398 |