Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9600870 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2017 | B2 | US2015243005 | 27.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91594808 | 06.03.2008 | US201514706751 | 07.05.2015 | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 | WO2006NO00189 | 19.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9036912 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2015 | B2 | US2009016606 | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 | WO2006NO00189 | 19.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006253155B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2012 | B2 | AU2006253155 | 07.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 | WO2006NO00189 | 19.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949303 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2012 | B1 | EP1949303 | 30.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 | WO2006NO00189 | 19.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2610214 | 07.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 | WO2006NO00189 | 19.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20080016L | 02.01.2008 | L | Priority number | Date | NO20080016 | 02.01.2008 | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 | WO2006NO00189 | 19.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006130012 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20052656D0 | 02.06.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2412482 | 20.02.2011 | C2 | RU2007149518 | 20.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | NO20052656 | 02.06.2005 |