EP1949303 - METHOD, SYSTEM, DIGITAL CAMERA AND ASIC FOR GEOMETRIC IMAGE TRANSFORMATION BASED ON TEXT LINE SEARCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumex AS Øvre Vollgate 7 0158 Oslo / NO | [2012/31] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Lumex As Ovre Vollgate 7 0158 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Hans, Christian Bygdøy Allé 33B N-0262 Oslo / NO | 02 /
CARLIN, Mats, Stefan Vallerveien 152 E N-1346 Gjettum / NO | 03 /
FOSSEIDE, Knut, Tharald Sagveien 8 N-1414 Trollåsen / NO | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2009/47] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2008/31] | Midttun, Gisle Johan Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 06747648.1 | 19.05.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006NO00189 | Priority number, date | NO20050002656 | 02.06.2005 Original published format: NO 20052656 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006130012 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1949303 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1949303 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/42, G06K9/32 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G06V30/1478 (EP,US);
G06T3/06 (EP,US);
G06T5/80 (US);
G06V30/166 (EP,US);
G06V30/224 (US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/33] | G06K9/32 | ||
Former IPC [2008/31] | G06K9/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM, DIGITALKAMERA UND ASIC ZUR GEOMETRISCHEN BILDTRANSFORMATION AUF DER BASIS EINER TEXTZEILENSUCHE | [2008/31] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM, DIGITAL CAMERA AND ASIC FOR GEOMETRIC IMAGE TRANSFORMATION BASED ON TEXT LINE SEARCHING | [2008/31] | French: | PROCEDE, SYSTEME, CAMERA NUMERIQUE ET CIRCUIT INTEGRE SPECIFIQUE (ASIC) POUR UNE TRANSFORMATION D'IMAGE GEOMETRIQUE BASEE SUR LA RECHERCHE DE LIGNES DE TEXTE | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 05.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.01.2008 | M02   Fee paid on   03.01.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2006 | AT | 01.08.2012 | BE | 01.08.2012 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | MC | 01.08.2012 | NL | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | TR | 01.08.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1276074 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [AP]US2005216564 (MYERS GREGORY K [US], et al); | [A] - LAVIALLE O. ET AL., "Active contours network to straighten distorted text lines", PROCEEDINGS. 2001 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (20011007), vol. 3, pages 748 - 751, XP001110232 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2001.958227 | Examination | US5689585 |