EP1866286 - PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS INHIBITORS OF PKC-THETA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [2009/22] |
Former [2007/51] | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH Binger Str. 173 D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSCHANTZ, Matt Aaron 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 02 /
LEMIEUX, Rene Marc 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 03 /
KIM, Jin Mi 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | 04 /
BRUNETTE, Steven Richard 900 Ridgebury Road, P.O. Box 368 Ridgefield, CT 06877-0368 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 06748747.0 | 27.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US11118 | Priority number, date | US20050665748P | 28.03.2005 Original published format: US 665748 P | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006105023 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866286 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866286 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/74, C07D401/12, C07D213/85, A61K31/44, A61K31/4523, A61P3/00, A61P37/00, A61P29/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
C07D213/74 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRIDINDERIVATE ALS PKC-THETA-HEMMER | [2007/51] | English: | PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS INHIBITORS OF PKC-THETA | [2007/51] | French: | DERIVES DE LA PYRIDINE UTILISABLES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE PKC-THETA | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.05.2009 | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | DK | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | LT | 27.05.2009 | LV | 27.05.2009 | NL | 27.05.2009 | PL | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | SE | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | IS | 27.09.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | BE | 27.05.2009 | |
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 27.05.2009 | |
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | BE | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | BE | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | BE | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | FI | 27.05.2009 | |
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03106451 (ALTANA PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-10* the whole document *; | [AD]US2004242613 (CARDOZO MARIO G [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * example -; claim - * |