EP1867015 - 6 KHz AND ABOVE GAS DISCHARGE LASER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UJAZDOWSKI, Richard C. 14540 Twin Peaks Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | 02 /
NESS, Richard M. 9248 Citrus View Court San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
ALGOTS, J. Martin 11015 Scripps Ranch Blvd. San Diego, California 92131 / US | 04 /
FLEUROV, Vladimir B. 20856 Viento Vialle Esondido, CA 92025 / US | 05 /
PALENSCHAT, Frederick A. 13702 Shoal Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 06 /
GILLESPIE, Walter D. 13004 Pomerad Way Poway, CA 92064 / US | 07 /
MOOSMAN, Bryan G. 1557 Archer Road San Marcos, CA 92078 / US | 08 /
STEIGER, Thomas D. 12080 Tivoli Park Row, 8 San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 09 /
SMITH, Brett D. 23787 Aspen Drive Murrieta, CA 92562 / US | 10 /
MCKELVY, Thomas E. 24527 Del Amo Road Ramona, CA 92065 / US | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
UJAZDOWSKI, Richard C. 14540 Twin Peaks Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | ||
02 /
NESS, Richard M. 9248 Citrus View Court San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
03 /
ALGOTS, J. Martin 11015 Scripps Ranch Blvd. San Diego, California 92131 / US | |||
04 /
FLEUROV, Vladimir B. 20856 Viento Vialle Esondido, CA 92025 / US | |||
05 /
PALENSCHAT, Frederick A. 14966 Avenida Venusto, 76 San Diego, CA 92128 / US | |||
06 /
GILLESPIE, Walter D. 13004 Pomerad Way Poway, CA 92064 / US | |||
07 /
MOOSMAN, Bryan G. 1557 Archer Road San Marcos, CA 92078 / US | |||
08 /
STEIGER, Thomas D. 12080 Tivoli Park Row, 8 San Diego, CA 92128 / US | |||
09 /
SMITH, Brett D. 23787 Aspen Drive Murrieta, CA 92562 / US | |||
10 /
MCKELVY, Thomas E. 24527 Del Amo Road Ramona, CA 92065 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06748829.6 | 27.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US11339 | Priority number, date | US20050095976 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: US 95976 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006105119 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1867015 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1867015 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/08, H01S3/03, H01S3/08, H01S3/22, H01F27/22, H01F38/02, H05K7/20, H01S3/036, H01S3/041, H01F3/10, H01F38/10, // H01S3/225, H01S3/04, H01S3/23 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
H01S3/036 (EP,US);
H01S3/041 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/22 (EP,US);
H01F3/10 (EP,US);
H01F38/10 (EP,US);
H01F27/266 (EP,US);
H01S3/0404 (EP,US);
H01S3/097 (EP,US);
H01S3/09702 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | H01F27/08, H01S3/03, H01S3/08, H01S3/22, H01F27/22, H01F38/02, H05K7/20, // H01S3/225, H01S3/04, H01S3/23 | ||
Former IPC [2009/02] | H01F27/08, H01S3/03, H01S3/08, H01S3/22 | ||
Former IPC [2007/51] | H01S3/22, H01S3/223 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2008/28] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GASENTLADUNGSLASERSYSTEM MIT 6 KHz UND MEHR | [2012/25] | English: | 6 KHz AND ABOVE GAS DISCHARGE LASER SYSTEM | [2007/51] | French: | SYSTEME LASER A DECHARGE DE GAZ A 6 KHz ET PLUS | [2012/25] |
Former [2007/51] | GASENTLADUNGSLASERSYSTEM MIT 6 KHZ UND MEHR | ||
Former [2007/51] | SYSTEME LASER A DECHARGE DE GAZ A 6 KHZ ET PLUS | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 04.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05327251 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]US6198761 (VON BERGMANN HUBERTUS [ZA], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 63; figures 1,3 * * column 6, line 50 - line 63 *; | [A]US2001019923 (MOLL ROGER [FR], et al) [A] 1-8* column 3 - column 4; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US6404637 (HUTCHISON RANDALL D [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 4, line 20 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]US6442181 (OLIVER I ROGER [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 8A-15 *; | [Y]DE10206271 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [YD]US2004264521 (NESS RICHARD M [US], et al) [YD] 1-8 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035]; figures 2-5 * | International search | [Y]US6198761 (VON BERGMANN HUBERTUS [ZA], et al); | [Y]US6404637 (HUTCHISON RANDALL D [US], et al); | [Y]US6426488 (SCHIELKE TASSO [DE]); | [Y]US5448580 (BIRX DANIEL L [US], et al); | [Y]US5730016 (ZITTEL GUNTER H [US]); | [Y]US5153892 (KAWAKUBO YUKIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003142714 (YAMASHITA TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [X]US4686680 (HOAG ETHAN [US], et al); | [Y]US3638137 (KRUPKE WILLIAM F) | [Y] - MULTI-CONTACT AG BASEL CH, "The Multilam Principle", MULTILAM TECHNOLOGY, MC-DTP, (200206), XP008144662 |