EP1874408 - MILD, STRUCTURED, MULTIPHASE PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOFFIN, Daniel, Jacob 19 Twin Lakes Drive Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | 02 /
SYFERT, Scott, William 11 Woodlawn Avenue Fort Mitchell, Kentucky 41017 / US | 03 /
WEI, Karl, Shiqing 4600 Cobblestone Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Edawrd, Dewey, III 6880 Man-o-war Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Hampton, Matthew John, et al Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Hampton, Matthew John, et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2009/50] | Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centre Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Wilding, Richard Alan Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06749195.1 | 31.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US12401 | Priority number, date | US20050670785P | 13.04.2005 Original published format: US 670785 P | US20050680114P | 12.05.2005 Original published format: US 680114 P | US20050680149P | 12.05.2005 Original published format: US 680149 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006113117 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874408 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/02, A61Q19/00, A61K8/03, A61K8/04 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/03 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MILDE, STRUKTURIERTE UND MEHRPHASIGE KÖRPERREINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2008/02] | English: | MILD, STRUCTURED, MULTIPHASE PERSONAL CLEANSING COMPOSITIONS | [2008/02] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE NETTOYAGE POUR L'HYGIENE PERSONNELLE DOUCES, STRUCTUREES ET MULTIPHASEES | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004092415 (FOCHT HEATHER LYNN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0015] , [0032] , [0050] - [0057] - [0079] - [0102] - [0121] , [0123] , [0127]; tables 1,23 *; | [X]WO2004100919 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 2, lines 15,16 * * page 3, lines 1-10 * * page 7, lines 11-19 * * page 14, lines 6-16; examples 1-16 *; | [X]US2004248748 (WEI KARL SHIQING [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0026] , [0060] - [0065] - [8390]; tables 1-3 *; | [PX]WO2005084614 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * page 2, lines 9-17 * * page 5, lines 20-27 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 12 * * page 14, lines 5-12 * * page 17, line 13 - page 19, line 6 * * examples 4-14 *; | [PX]WO2005084616 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * page 8, line 31 - page 9, line 14 * * page 14, line 27 - page 17, line 14 ** example - * |