EP1869132 - FLOOR FINISH STRIPPER COMPOSITION THAT THICKENS FOLLOWING DILUTION WITH WATER AND METHOD OF STRIPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US | [2012/02] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul MN 55102-2233 / US | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center, 370 North Wabasha Street Saint Paul, MN 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIESE, Gregory, G. 734 Gherty Lane Hudson, Wisconsin 54016 / US | 02 /
LEVITT, Mark, D. 593 Cimarron Lake Elmo, MN 55042 / US | 03 /
LEAFBLAD, Brian, R. 770 Hawthorne Avenue E. St. Paul, Minnesota 55106 / US | 04 /
LI, Minyu 7021 19th Street North Oakdale, Minnesota 55128 / US | 05 /
HEI, Robert, D., P. 2224 30th Avenue Baldwin, Wisconsin 54002 / US | 06 /
LANGE, Steven, J. 1900 Montreal Avenue St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | 07 /
SHULMAN, Jan, E. 8 Hibiscus Place Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/52] | 01 /
GRIESE, Gregory, G. 734 Gherty Lane Hudson, Wisconsin 54016 / US | ||
02 /
LEVITT, Mark, D. 429 Front Avenue St. Paul, Minnesota 55117 / US | |||
03 /
LEAFBLAD, Brian, R. 770 Hawthorne Avenue E. St. Paul, Minnesota 55106 / US | |||
04 /
LI, Minyu 7021 19th Street North Oakdale, Minnesota 55128 / US | |||
05 /
HEI, Robert, D., P. 2224 30th Avenue Baldwin, Wisconsin 54002 / US | |||
06 /
LANGE, Steven, J. 1900 Montreal Avenue St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | |||
07 /
SHULMAN, Jan, E. 8 Hibiscus Place Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | Representative(s) | polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 06749418.7 | 06.04.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US12817 | Priority number, date | US20050107307 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: US 107307 | US20060396146 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: US 396146 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006113144 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1869132 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1869132 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09D9/00 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
C09D9/005 (EP,US);
C09D9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Title | German: | NACH VERDÜNNUNG MIT WASSER VERDICKTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM ABBZEIZEN VON BODENBELÄGEN UND ABBEIZVERFAHREN | [2007/52] | English: | FLOOR FINISH STRIPPER COMPOSITION THAT THICKENS FOLLOWING DILUTION WITH WATER AND METHOD OF STRIPPING | [2007/52] | French: | COMPOSITION DECAPANTE POUR ENDUIT DE SOL, QUI S'EPAISSIT LORSQU'ELLE EST MELANGEE A DE L'EAU, ET PROCEDE DE DECAPAGE | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2006 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | IE | 06.04.2012 | LU | 06.04.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GB | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | FR | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.04.2012 | ||
LU | 06.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GB | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GB | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GB | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GB | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
FR | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GB | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 06.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5364551 (LENTSCH STEVEN E [US], et al) [X] 28-30,32,33,35,36,40-42 * claim 18 * * column 4, line 48 * * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 47 * * column 8, line 50 - line 59 *; | [X]US5783538 (TOTOKI TAKATOSHI [JP]) [X] 28-33,40 * column 9 - column 10; examples 1-4; table 1 ** claims 1,3,4 *; | [X]US2003031801 (OLSON KEITH E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,15-17,26-33,35-37,43 * claims 1,4,7 * * page 2, paragraph 15 * * page 2, paragraph 17 - page 3 * * page 4, paragraph 28 *; | [X]US2004121932 (GRIESE GREG G [US], et al) [X] 28-30,35,40-42 * claims 1,8,11 * * page 2, paragraph 23 - paragraph 27 * * page 3, paragraph 34 - paragraph 35 * * page 10, paragraph 132 - page 11, paragraph 133 * * page 13, paragraph 174 - paragraph 176 * |