Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
02.12.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.10.2009 | Change - PCT data | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
29.05.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.06.2008 | Change - extension states | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
07.12.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
07.12.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
05.12.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.11.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.11.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.11.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.10.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.10.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.07.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication |