EP1868656 - BIOACTIVE STENTS FOR TYPE II DIABETICS AND METHODS FOR USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medivas, LLC 6275 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARPENTER, Kenneth, W. 7526 Rue Michael La Jolla, California 92037 / US | 02 /
TURNELL, William, G. 14032 Mango Drive San Diego, California 92014 / US | 03 /
DEFIFE, Kristin, M. 4917 Chaucer Avenue San Diego, California 92120 / US | 04 /
GRAKO, Kathryn, A. 6223 Canyon Bluff Court San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Vandevijver, Pascale, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Vandevijver, Pascale, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2007/52] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06749606.7 | 04.04.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US13214 | Priority number, date | US20050098891 | 04.04.2005 Original published format: US 98891 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006108167 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868656 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/10 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61K51/00 (KR);
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0068 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L89/00 (EP,US);
A61L31/10, C08L89/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/52] | A61K51/00, A61M36/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOAKTIVE STENTS FÜR TYP-II-DIABETIKER UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/52] | English: | BIOACTIVE STENTS FOR TYPE II DIABETICS AND METHODS FOR USE THEREOF | [2007/52] | French: | STENTS BIOACTIF POUR DIABÉTIQUES DE TYPE II ET MÉTHODES POUR L UTILISER | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 05.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03057218 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-23 * claim 1 * * examples 1-3 *; | [Y]US2004063606 (CHU CHIH-CHANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * claim 89 ** paragraph [0284] *; | [X]WO2004075781 (MEDIVAS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-23 * claims 1,12,20,23-25 *; | [XP]WO2005097186 (MEDIVAS LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-23 * claims 1-66 * | International search | [A]US2005019366 (ZELDIS JEROME B [US]) |