EP1768950 - PROCESS FOR MAKING (S)-PREGABALIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYMON, Asher 79 Menachem Begin St. 49732 Petach Tikva / IL | 02 /
KANSAL, Vinod, Kumar H.No. 1396, Sector-14 Faridabad / IN | 03 /
HEDVATI, Lilach Ein-Shemer Doar Na Hefer-37845 / IL | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06749819.6 | 11.04.2006 | [2007/14] | WO2006US13565 | Priority number, date | US20050670425P | 11.04.2005 Original published format: US 670425 P | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006110783 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1768950 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/32, C07C229/24, C07D207/26 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
C07D207/277 (EP,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,US);
C07C229/24 (EP,US);
C07D207/08 (EP,US);
C07D207/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C227/18, C07C229/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR (S)-PREGABALIN | [2007/14] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING (S)-PREGABALIN | [2007/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE (S)-PREGABALINE | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXY]WO2006000904 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-3 * General formulas 2 and 7 Compounds 10, 15 * * example 5 * [PY] 8,82-85,88-94,96-108; | [Y] - BERNER, TEDESCHI, ENDERS, "Asymmetric Michael Additions to Nitroalkenes", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2002), pages 1877 - 1894, XP002397014 [Y] 8,82-85,88-94,96-108 * Synthesis of 120 from 118. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1099-0690(200206)2002:12<1877::AID-EJOC1877>3.0.CO;2-U | [A] - COLONGE J ET AL, "PREPARATION DE PYRROLIDONES-2 ET DE GAMMA-AMINOACIDES", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, SOCIETE FRANCAISE DE CHIMIE. PARIS, FR, (1962), ISSN 0037-8968, pages 598 - 603, XP002027979 [A] 1-109 * the whole document * | [A] - MARTIN, RABASSEDA, LEESON, CASTAÑER, "Pregabalin", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (1999), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 862 - 870, XP002397017 [A] 1-109 * Schemes 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/dof.1999.024.08.545995 |