EP1868546 - ACTIVE CONTROL OF AN ANKLE-FOOT ORTHOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 2-1-1, Minamiaoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARIUSH, Behzad C/O Legal Department Honda R & D Americas, INC. 21001 State Route 739 Raymond, Ohio 43067-9705 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06750178.3 | 12.04.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US14069 | Priority number, date | US20050670732P | 12.04.2005 Original published format: US 670732 P | US20060402487 | 11.04.2006 Original published format: US 402487 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006110895 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1868546 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868546 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
A61H3/008 (EP);
A61H3/00 (EP);
B25J9/0006 (EP);
B62D57/032 (EP);
A61H1/0266 (EP);
A61H2003/007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVE STEUERUNG EINER FUSSGELENKORTHESE | [2007/52] | English: | ACTIVE CONTROL OF AN ANKLE-FOOT ORTHOSIS | [2007/52] | French: | CONTROLE ACTIF D'UNE ORTHESE PEDI-JAMBIERE | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 14.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | CZ | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | EE | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | IT | 25.03.2009 | LT | 25.03.2009 | LV | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | PL | 25.03.2009 | RO | 25.03.2009 | SI | 25.03.2009 | SK | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | IE | 12.04.2009 | LU | 12.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | BG | 25.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | ES | 06.07.2009 | IS | 25.07.2009 | PT | 31.08.2009 | HU | 26.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.04.2009 | ||
LU | 12.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.04.2009 | ||
LU | 12.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 12.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1103451 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1361027 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1410780 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]EP1415770 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]EP1422128 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0062] * | International search | [Y]US5044360 (JANKE WAYNE R [US]); | [X]US2003115031 (DARIUSH BEHZAD [US], et al); | [Y]US2004031169 (JENSEN JEFFREY L [US], et al); | [Y]US2004249319 (DARIUSH BEHZAD [US]); | [Y]US2005070834 (HERR HUGH [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1422128 |