Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7772238 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2010 | B2 | US2009069391 | 12.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91891206 | 14.04.2006 | US67312105 | 20.04.2005 | WO2006US14093 | 14.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008536925 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US67312105 | 20.04.2005 | WO2006US14093 | 14.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006240248 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67312105 | 20.04.2005 | WO2006US14093 | 14.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1874755 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2010 | A4 | EP1874755 | 09.01.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US67312105 | 20.04.2005 | WO2006US14093 | 14.04.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2603986 | 02.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US67312105 | 20.04.2005 | WO2006US14093 | 14.04.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006115835 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2006 | A3 | WO2006115835 | 02.11.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US67312105 | 20.04.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101163690 | 16.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US67312105 | 20.04.2005 |