EP1874755 - BENZOTHIOPHENE HYDROXAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2010/10] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBBS, Jed Lee 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
KATTAR, Sam 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
METHOT, Joey 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
MILLER, Thomas 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | 05 /
SILIPHAIVANH, Phieng 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
STANTON, Matthew 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 07 /
WILSON, Kevin 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 08 /
WITTER, David, J. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, MA 02115-5727 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Hussain, Deeba, et al Merck & Co., Inc. Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06750201.3 | 14.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US14093 | Priority number, date | US20050673121P | 20.04.2005 Original published format: US 673121 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006115835 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874755 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/56, C07D271/10, A61K31/38, A61K31/41, A61P25/00, A61P35/00 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
C07D333/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/38 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/41 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/02] | C07D333/56, C07D271/10, A61K31/38, A61K31/41 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZOTHIOPHEN-HYDROXAMSÄURE-DERIVATE | [2008/02] | English: | BENZOTHIOPHENE HYDROXAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES | [2008/02] | French: | DERIVES BENZOTHIOPHENE D'ACIDE HYDROXAMIQUE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9912884 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-18* page 41; claims 1-6; compounds 19, 38 *; | [YA]WO03011851 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-13,15-18 * claims 1-9 * [A] 14; | [YA]US6541661 (DELORME DANIEL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-13,15-18 * claims 1,2, 4-9, 11-12, 15-21,; compounds 71, 72, 73, 138, 142, 144, 148, 149, 176, 170,178 * [A] 14; | [AP]WO2005034880 (ATON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2005066151 (SYRRX INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6730670 (ALANINE ALEXANDER [FR], et al); | [A]US7019026 (ANDERSEN HENRIK SUNE [DK], et al); | [A]US7105564 (HONMA TSUNETOSHI [JP], et al) |