EP2016376 - METERING AND DISPENSING CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diversey, Inc. 8310 16th Street, M/S 509 P.O. Box 902 Sturtevant, WI 53177-0902 / US | [2010/29] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Johnsondiversey, Inc. Gregory S. Bollis - M/S 509,8310 16th Street P.O. Box 902 Sturtevant, WI 53177 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBSTER, Tyson, L. 128 Franklin Street Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 02 /
DEEDS, M., Rinley 8484 Zayante Road Felton, CA 95018 / US | 03 /
LIVINGSTON, James, W. 170 Corday Lane Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 04 /
SWAIN, Andy 31, Glendon Drive Hucknall Notingham NG15 6DF / GB | 05 /
HOLDEN, David Allen Hill House 10 Woolley Road Matlock Derbyshire DE4 3HS / GB | 06 /
BIRD, Kenneth, J. 32 Sandringham Bramcote Hills Beeston Nottingham NG9 3EJ / GB | [2009/10] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
WEBSTER, Tyson, L. 4575 Dawn Lane - Apt. A Soquel, CA 95073 / US | ||
02 /
DEEDS, M., Rinley 8484 Zayante Road Felton, CA 95018 / US | |||
03 /
LIVINGSTON, James, W. 170 Corday Lane Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | |||
04 /
SWAIN, Andy 31, Glendon Drive Hucknall Notingham NG15 6DF / GB | |||
05 /
HOLDEN, David Allen Hill House 10 Woolley Road Matlock Derbyshire DE4 3HS / GB | |||
06 /
BIRD, Kenneth, J. 32 Sandringham Bramcote Hills Beeston Nottingham NG9 3EJ / GB | Representative(s) | van Heuvel, Margaretha, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | van Heuvel, Margaretha, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 06750414.2 | 14.04.2006 | [2009/04] | WO2006US14364 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007120133 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2016376 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2016376 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01F11/46, A47L15/44, D06F39/02 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
G01F11/46 (EP);
A47L15/4418 (EP);
A47L15/4436 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZÄHLENDES UND ABGEBENDES GEHÄUSE | [2009/04] | English: | METERING AND DISPENSING CLOSURE | [2009/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION À FONCTION DE MESURE ET DE DISTRIBUTION | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 23.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10189862.5 / EP2366982 | EP19156625.6 | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2010 | BE | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | LT | 10.11.2010 | LV | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | IE | 14.04.2011 | LU | 14.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.04.2011 | ||
LU | 14.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
IE | 14.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 10.11.2010 | |
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 10.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1068510 (VALENTE CARLO E) [A] 1-24,36,37 * page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 21; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4964185 (LEHN CHRIS F [US]) [A] 25-35* column 3, line 60 - column 5, line 46 *; | [A]US5495962 (NOMURA AKICHIKA [JP]) [A] 1-24,36,37 * column 6, line 22 - column 8, line 63; figures 1,3 *; | [XA]WO2005114115 (JOHNSON DIVERSEY INC [US], et al) [X] 36 * the whole document * [A] 1-35,37 | by applicant | US5007559 | WO2005114115 |