EP1888715 - PROCESS FOR REDUCING BROMINE INDEX OF HYDROCARBON FEEDSTOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. A Corporation of the State Delaware 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Stephen, H. 45 Mullens Lane Bernardsville, New Jersey 07924 / US | 02 /
MOHR, Gary, D. 2522 Deep Oak Court Houston, Texas 77059 / US | 03 /
CLARK, Michael, C. 4306 Raintree Court Pasadena, Texas 77505 / US | 04 /
LAWRENCE, Selma 1818 Wilson Street Houston, Texas 77019 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 06750489.4 | 18.04.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US14461 | Priority number, date | US20050140182 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: US 140182 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006130248 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1888715 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C10G53/02, C10G53/08, C10G29/16, C10G25/00, C10G25/03, C10G69/12, C10G67/06, C10G67/14 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
C10G29/16 (EP,KR,US);
C10G53/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10G25/00 (KR);
C10G25/003 (EP,US);
C10G25/03 (EP,US);
C10G53/08 (EP,KR,US);
C10G67/06 (EP,US);
C10G67/14 (EP,US);
C10G69/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER BROMZAHL VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFF-AUSGANGSSTOFFEN | [2008/08] | English: | PROCESS FOR REDUCING BROMINE INDEX OF HYDROCARBON FEEDSTOCKS | [2008/08] | French: | TRAITEMENT POUR REDUIRE L'INDICE DE BROME DES CHARGES D'HYDROCARBURES | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 09.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2016 | 21.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US6500996 (BROWN STEPHEN H [US], et al) [XD] 1-20 * examples 3,6,7; claims 1,2,6 * * column 2, lines 5-7 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 17 * * column 3, lines 27-38 * * column 4, lines 12-16,56-67 * * column 5, lines 29-42,52-67 * * column 6, lines 2-22,27-30,44-49 * * column 7, lines 45,46 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 12 * * column 1, lines 34-44 *; | [X]EP0692307 (ENICHEM AUGUSTA IND [IT]) [X] 1,8,9,12,13,15,16 * claims 11,13 * * page 2, lines 49-56 * * page 5, lines 27,28 *; | [A]EP0432814 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,12 * * page 3, lines 15,16 *; | [PX]US2006020154 (LO FREDERICK Y [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,5,7-9,12,13,15 * claims 1,15,24 * * page 3, paragraphs 30,31 * | by applicant | US3923639 | US3950496 | US3972983 | US3308069 | USRE28341E | US2882244 | US3293192 | US3449070 | US4954325 | US5229341 | US5236575 | US5362697 | US5102643 | US5098684 | US5371310 | US5453554 | US5493065 | US5557024 | US3354078 | - JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (1965), vol. 4, page 527 | - JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, vol. 6, page 278 | - JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (1980), vol. 61, page 395 |