EP1871851 - ULTRAVIOLET-CURED PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE OR FILM WITHOUT SUPPORTING SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAKI, Shunsuke 33-1, Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06750572.7 | 18.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006US14565 | Priority number, date | JP20050120204 | 18.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005120204 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006113715 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1871851 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/00, C08F299/06, C09J175/16, C08G18/67 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
C09J175/16 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/58 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/674 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/10 (EP,US);
C09J7/21 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2170/40 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2301/1242 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2400/263 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2475/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/2809 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/674, C08G18/42 (EP,US);
C09J175/16, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRAVIOLETT GEHÄRTETES HAFTKLEBEMITTEL IN TRÄGERLOSER BAND- ODER FOLIENFORM | [2008/01] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET-CURED PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE TAPE OR FILM WITHOUT SUPPORTING SUBSTRATE | [2008/01] | French: | BANDE OU PELLICULE ADHESIVE SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION, A SECHAGE PAR ULTRAVIOLET, SANS SUBSTRAT DE SUPPORT | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 19.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1546815 (LOCITITE CORP) [Y] 5,6,21 * page 2, line 16 - page 5, line 25 ** page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 16; claim - *; | [XY]EP0628616 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,9-20,22,23 * abstract * * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 52 * * examples 1-4,7-9,12-14,16; claims 2,9,10,14; tables 2,3 * [Y] 5,6,21; | [XY]EP0994167 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-20,22,23 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0019] - [0021]; claims 10,12,15 * [Y] 5,6,21; | [XY]WO0116244 (COGNIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,9-20,22,23 * abstract * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 2 * * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 25; examples 1,5; claims 1,15 * [Y] 5,6,21 |