EP1874445 - METHOD FOR RECOVERY OF SPILLED OIL OR OTHER VISCOUS FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/02] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERY OF SPILLED OIL OR OTHER VISCOUS FLUID | ||
[2014/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, PT | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2014/52] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROJE, Victoria 175 Sherwood Drive Santa Barbara, California 93110 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [2014/52] |
Former [2012/24] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06750686.5 | 18.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US14709 | Priority number, date | US20050673043P | 19.04.2005 Original published format: US 673043 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006113784 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874445 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874445 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/02, B01D17/02, E02B15/04 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
B01D17/0202 (EP,US);
E02B15/103 (EP,US);
Y02A20/204 (EP,US);
Y10S210/923 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/02] | B01D69/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERAUFNAHME VON AUSGELAUFENEM ÖL UND ANDEREN VISKOSEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2014/39] | English: | METHOD FOR RECOVERY OF SPILLED OIL OR OTHER VISCOUS FLUID | [2014/39] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A RECUPERER DE L'HUILE REPANDUE OU AUTRE LIQUIDE VISQUEUX | [2014/39] |
Former [2008/02] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERAUFNAHME VON AUSGELAUFENEM ÖL UND ANDEREN VISKOSEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | ||
Former [2008/02] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERY OF SPILLED OIL OR OTHER VISCOUS FLUID | ||
Former [2008/02] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A RECUPERER DE L'HUILE REPANDUE OU AUTRE LIQUIDE VISQUEUX | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 18.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13165636.5 / EP2656906 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2006 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BE | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | LT | 24.12.2014 | LV | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | NL | 24.12.2014 | PL | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.03.2015 | IE | 18.04.2015 | LU | 18.04.2015 | IS | 24.04.2015 | PT | 24.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | LT | 24.12.2014 | |
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | LT | 24.12.2014 | |
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 24.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US3338414 (LEFKE LOUIS W, et al) [X] 1-4,12,14-16 * figures 1-3; claims 1,5 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 32 * [Y] 8-11 [I] 5-7,13; | [X]US4642185 (TURNER JOHN T [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,14-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 2, line 52 *; | [Y]US4741827 (KLINAR GOTTFRIED [AT], et al) [Y] 8-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 24 *; | [A]US6110386 (UNDERHILL JASPER [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4, lines 51-67 *; | [A]EP1144763 (LMP PATENTS LTD AB OY [FI]) [A] 1-16 * figure 4; claim 1 ** paragraphs [0001] , [0009] * | International search | [A]US3865730 (AYERS RAY R, et al); | [X]US5143629 (LINT CHRISTIAN L [US]); | [Y]US5316672 (WILSON DONALD L [US], et al) | Examination | US3314545 | US3947360 | GB2027604 | by applicant | - JOKUTY, P. ET AL., OIL ADHESION TESTING - RECENT RESULTS |