EP1872453 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING UNINTERRUPTIBLE POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Power Conversion Corporation 132 Fairgrounds Road West Kingston, RI 02892 / US | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INGEMI, Michael 9 Geraldine Drive Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US | 02 /
LANDSMAN, Emanuel 3 Brookwood Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02420 / US | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06750775.6 | 20.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006US14819 | Priority number, date | US20050111679 | 21.04.2005 Original published format: US 111679 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006115959 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1872453 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1872453 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
H02J9/062 (EP,US);
H02J9/063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | H02H3/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER UNUNTERBRECHBAREN STROMVERSORGUNG | [2008/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING UNINTERRUPTIBLE POWER | [2008/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FOURNITURE D'ALIMENTATION SANS COUPURE | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 23.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2006 | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.04.2006 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6181581 (JOHNSON JR ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * columns 11,12; figure 9 *; | [A]WO0113491 (POWERWARE CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* pages 1,2; figures 4,10 *; | [A]US2003137197 (RADDI WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027]; figures 3, 4A,4B, 5A, %B, &A, &B *; | [A]US2004108836 (MATSUDA KENSAKU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0055]; figures 1,4 * * figures 5a-8B * | International search | [Y]US2004213022 (RADDI WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [Y]US5426349 (NILSSEN OLE K [US]) | by applicant | US2003137197 | US2004108836 |