Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1948715 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1948715



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(50)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 195
17.01.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
15.03.2013 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
14.02.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.01.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.01.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
25.01.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.01.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.09.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.09.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.09.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.09.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
04.06.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.07.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.03.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.03.2010 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
04.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
04.03.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.03.2010 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
18.02.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.09.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
03.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
03.04.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
24.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.11.2008 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
17.10.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.10.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
09.09.2008 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
21.08.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.08.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 8
21.08.2008 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 5
01.08.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
03.07.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.07.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
02.07.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.06.2008 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.06.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
27.05.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.05.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
09.05.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
29.02.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.05.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 40
26.04.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.04.2007 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 28