EP1879989 - FABRIC CARE COMPOSITION COMPRISING POLYMER ENCAPSULATED FABRIC OR SKIN BENEFICIATING INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIBEL, Marija 115 Benner Street Highland Park, New Jersey 08904 / US | 02 /
BIGNELL, Lisa 535 New Brunswick Road Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | 03 /
PEETERS, Myriam Rue Haut des Tawes 268/6 B-4000 Liege / BE | 04 /
JACQUES, Alain 202 Rue De L'Institut B-4670 Blegny / BE | 05 /
FAROOQ, Amjad 54 Fisher Drive Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06751739.1 | 27.04.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US16177 | Priority number, date | US20050123578 | 06.05.2005 Original published format: US 123578 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006121639 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879989 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D1/40, C11D3/37, C11D17/00, C11D3/50 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
C11D3/3723 (EP,US);
C11D1/40 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
C11D3/3769 (EP,US);
C11D3/505 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEXTILBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL MIT POLYMERUMHÜLLTEM TEXTIL- ODER HAUTPFLEGEMITTEL | [2008/04] | English: | FABRIC CARE COMPOSITION COMPRISING POLYMER ENCAPSULATED FABRIC OR SKIN BENEFICIATING INGREDIENT | [2008/04] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR L'ENTRETIEN DES TEXTILES, COMPRENANT UN INGREDIENT POUR L'ENTRETIEN DES TISSUS OU DU CUIR ENCAPSULE DANS UN POLYMERE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO02074430 (QUEST INT [NL], et al) [YD] 1-27 * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 9; example -; claims 1-5,7,8 *; | [DY]US6620777 (HEIBEL MARIJA [US], et al) [DY] 1-27 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 12; example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP1407754 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [Y] 1-27* paragraphs [0020] , [0063]; example -; claims 1,4,5,-12,14 * |