EP1889108 - FIBER OPTIC CABLES AND METHODS FOR FORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMSCOPE INC. OF NORTH CAROLINA 1100 Commscope Place, SE Hickory North Carolina 28601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states CommScope, Inc. of North Carolina 1100 Commscope Place, SE Hickory North Carolina 28601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASCHAL, Kevin S. 1221 Willow Creek Drive Newton, North Carolina 28658 / US | 02 /
HATCH, Nathan 4741 Bert Huffman Drive Granite Falls, North Carolina 28630 / US | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
PASCHAL, Kevin S. 1221 Willow Creek Drive Claremont, North Carolina 28610 / US | ||
02 /
HATCH, Nathan 4741 Bert Huffman Drive Claremont, North Carolina 28610 / US | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06752467.8 | 10.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US18027 | Priority number, date | US20050688492P | 08.06.2005 Original published format: US 688492 P | US20050688493P | 08.06.2005 Original published format: US 688493 P | US20060412616 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: US 412616 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006135513 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1889108 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
G02B6/443 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/44 (KR);
G02B6/3885 (EP,US);
G02B6/38875 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US);
G02B6/441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHE KABEL UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2008/08] | English: | FIBER OPTIC CABLES AND METHODS FOR FORMING THE SAME | [2008/08] | French: | CABLES DE FIBRE OPTIQUE ET PROCEDES POUR FORMER CEUX-CI | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.01.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/08] | 12.01.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/08] | Appeal following examination | 05.04.2013 | Appeal received No. T1704/13 | 15.05.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.01.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP10184040.3 / EP2278372 | EP17151059.7 / EP3179286 | EP20169371.0 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1310814 (CORNING CABLE SYS LLC [US]) [X] 1-20 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 23 - line 25 * * column 5, line 33 - line 35 * * column 5, lines 26-28 * * column 5, line 44 - line 48 * * column 2, line 18 - line 25 * * column 3, line 33 - line 35 * * column 6, line 44 - line 49 ** column 6, line 35 - line 38 * | Examination | FR2296190 | EP0126509 | US5073043 | US5475782 | US5630003 | WO0133276 | EP1122566 | US6567592 | US2005053343 |