EP2027957 - A STRONG HIGH PERFORMANCE TWIST DRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Revocation of patent | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Tiangong Tools Co., Ltd. HouxiangTown Danyang City, Jiangsu 212-300 / CN | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Xiaokun c/o Jiangsu Tiangong Tools Co., Ltd. Houxiang Town Danyang City, Jiangsu 212-300 / CN | [2012/09] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
ZHU, Xiaokun c/o Jiangsu Tiangong Tools Co., Ltd. Houxiang Town, Danyang City Jiangsu 212300 / CN | ||
Former [2009/09] | 01 /
ZHU, Xiaokun Houxiang Town, Danyang Jiangsu 212300 / CN | Representative(s) | Allgayer, Ulla Barbara Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Allgayer, Ulla Barbara Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Allgayer, Ulla Barbara Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06752927.1 | 09.06.2006 | [2009/09] | WO2006CN01276 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007143883 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027957 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027957 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2027957 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/00, B23B51/02 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B23B51/02 (EP,US);
B23B2251/04 (EP,US);
B23B2251/14 (EP,US);
B23B2251/18 (EP,US);
Y10T408/9097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | STARKER HOCHLEISTUNGSSPIRALBOHRER | [2009/09] | English: | A STRONG HIGH PERFORMANCE TWIST DRILL | [2009/09] | French: | FORET HÉLICOÏDAL RÉSISTANT À HAUTES PERFORMANCES | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2008 | Translation filed | 12.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 28.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE ALPEN-MAYKESTAG GmbH Urstein Nord 67 5412 Puch / AT Opponent's representative TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/03] | 13.02.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.04.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2006 | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | IT | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | IE | 09.06.2012 | LU | 09.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 07.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE19807609 (WERKZEUGFABRIK GMBH KOENIGSEE [DE]) [I] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO0003825 (COLVIN KEVIN F [US]) [A] 2* page 5, line 24 - line 25 *; | [I] - Bruins, Dräger, Werkzeuge und Werkzeugmaschinen für die spanende Metallberarbeitung, München, DE, Carl Hanser Verlag, (19840101), vol. 1, pages 120 - 121, ISBN 3-446-13787-4, XP002605683 [I] 1-8 * page 120, paragraph 1 - page 121, paragraph 2; figure 181 * | [I] - COLVIN, STANLEY, DRILLING AND SURFACE PRACTICE, NEW YORK, MC GRAW HILL, (19430101), pages 8 - 9, XP002605684 [I] 1-8 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 4, 5 * | [I] - SPÜR, STÖFERLE, HANDBUCH DER FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK, MÜNCHEN, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (19790101), vol. 3, page 357, ISBN 3-446-12534-5, XP002605685 [I] 1-8 * page 357; figures 5, 6 * | International search | [A]CN2192422Y (WANG YAPING [CN]); | [A]DE19807609 (WERKZEUGFABRIK GMBH KOENIGSEE [DE]); | [A]JPH11267912 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP); | [A]CN2499154Y (TIANGONG TOOLS CO LTD JIANGSU [CN]); | [A]CN2663065Y (JIANGSU TIANGONG TOOLS CO LTD [CN]); | [A]JP2005205526 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP) |