|
27.03.2024 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2024 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.10.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.04.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.03.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.03.2022 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
57 |
|
25.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
28 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
189 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
16.04.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2021 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
51 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
68 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.03.2021 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
22.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.05.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.12.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.05.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
21.05.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
21.05.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.05.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.05.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.05.2007 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.04.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.04.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.03.2007 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
30.03.2007 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |