Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8231922 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2012 | B2 | US2009123630 | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26328008 | 31.10.2008 | US44297506 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006280779 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44297506 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101352288B | Global Dossier | 16.01.2014 | B1 | KR20080018917 | 28.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5455365B | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | B2 | JP2008541740 | 27.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2308324 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06753297 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006254548C | Global Dossier | 20.09.2012 | C1 | AU2006254548B | 10.05.2012 | B9 | AU2006254548B | 22.03.2012 | B2 | AU2006254548 | 07.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1901620 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2020 | B1 | EP1901620 | 26.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0610945 | 20.09.2016 | B1 | BRPI0610945 | 03.08.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2611121 | 28.01.2014 | C | CA2611121 | 07.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1901620T | 28.09.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2820337T | 20.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ563564 | 25.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006DK00303 | 31.05.2006 | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006128465 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5727392B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2015 | B2 | JP2012061012 | 29.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR057042 | 14.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1901620T | 28.09.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2420083 | 10.06.2011 | C2 | RU2007148557 | 20.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US68552705 | 31.05.2005 | Type | Divisional application | EP2308324 |