EP1890821 - CENTRIFUGE ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 55 - 85 48147 Münster / DE | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEINIG, Uwe Dr. Renhardsweilerstrasse 13/1 88348 Bad Saulgau / DE | 02 /
BAUMANN, Dieter Überwasserstrasse 10 48268 Greven / DE | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
MEINIG, Uwe Hägerstr. 274 48161 Münster / DE | ||
02 /
BAUMANN, Dieter Überwasserstrasse 10 48268 Greven / DE | Representative(s) | Linnemann, Winfried, et al Schulze Horn & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Voßgasse 3 48143 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Linnemann, Winfried, et al Schulze Horn & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 01 52 48050 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 06753443.8 | 28.04.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006EP03963 | Priority number, date | DE20052007156U | 02.05.2005 Original published format: DE 202005007156 U | [2008/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117142 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890821 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890821 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B04B7/12, B04B5/00 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
B04B5/005 (EP,US);
B04B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
B04B5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTOR FÜR EINE ZENTRIFUGE | [2008/09] | English: | CENTRIFUGE ROTOR | [2008/09] | French: | ROTOR DE CENTRIFUGEUSE | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 25.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.12.2008 | CZ | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | IE | 24.12.2008 | LT | 24.12.2008 | LV | 24.12.2008 | NL | 24.12.2008 | PL | 24.12.2008 | RO | 24.12.2008 | SI | 24.12.2008 | SK | 24.12.2008 | TR | 24.12.2008 | BG | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | IS | 24.04.2009 | AT | 28.04.2009 | LU | 28.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | HU | 25.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
HU | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 24.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2755992 (HENRY TAIT WILLIAM, et al); | [A]WO0245864 (FLEETGUARD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 7, column 15 - page 8, column 20; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP1277515 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0064]; figures 20,21 *; | [A]EP1340547 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * figures 2,3; claims 4,11 *; | [A]DE102004005920 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0052] , [0056] , [0057]; figures 1-4,6,7,25,26 * |