EP1880185 - AUTOMATED INSPECTION OF COLORED CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [2010/30] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/04] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
NOVARTIS-PHARMA GMBH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCKER, Robert, Carey 615 Stonestyle Trace Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | 02 /
QUINN, Michael, Hugh 7515 Ledgewood Way Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [2008/31] | Heinen, Detlef BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/04] | Heinen, Detlef BOHEST IP A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG, Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06753476.8 | 03.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006EP04131 | Priority number, date | US20050677721P | 04.05.2005 Original published format: US 677721 P | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006117205 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1880185 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1880185 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/02, B29D11/00 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
B29D11/00125 (EP,US);
B29D11/0025 (EP,US);
B29D11/00317 (EP,US);
B29D11/0098 (EP,US);
G01N21/958 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE PRÜFUNG VON FARBIGEN KONTAKTLINSEN | [2008/04] | English: | AUTOMATED INSPECTION OF COLORED CONTACT LENSES | [2008/04] | French: | INSPECTION AUTOMATISEE DE LENTILLES DE CONTACT COLOREES | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10153446.9 / EP2192397 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5034166 (RAWLINGS DAVID L [US], et al) [DA] 4-7 * abstract * * column 10, line 14 - column 11, line 53; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO9932869 (NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 9 - page 22, line 3; figures 1-24 *; | [AD]US6047082 (RHODY HARVEY E [US], et al) [AD] 1-7 * column A * * column 4, line 49 - column 8, line 5; figures 1-5 * * column 9, line 58 - column 11, line 48 * * column 14, line 35 - column 15, line 13 *; | [AD]US6471891 (CAMERON ROBERT [US]) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 20 * * column 3, line 51 - column 7, line 27; figures 1-9 *; | [XY]WO2004044545 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 3, line 14 - page 25, line 32; figures 1-13 * [Y] 4-7; | [Y]US2005056954 (DEVLIN BRIAN GERRARD [US], et al) [Y] 4-7 * abstract * * page 12, paragraph 136 - page 13, paragraph 136 * * figures 1-5 * * claim 1 *; | [AP]WO2005054807 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [AP] 1-7 * abstract ** page 3, line 6 - page 5, paragraph L; figures 1-3 * |