EP1898705 - OIL SUSPENSION CONCENTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIXL, Frank Ellernstrasse 4 26529 Rechtsupweg / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Annika Graf-Dietrich-Strasse 4 65594 Runkel / DE | [2008/12] | Application number, filing date | 06753600.3 | 13.05.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006EP04521 | Priority number, date | EP20050012120 | 04.06.2005 Original published format: EP 05012120 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006131187 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1898705 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1898705 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36, A01N25/04 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A01N47/36 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | 04.01.2008 | HR | 04.01.2008 | MK | 04.01.2008 | YU | 04.01.2008 | Title | German: | ÖLSUSPENSIONSKONZENTRAT | [2008/12] | English: | OIL SUSPENSION CONCENTRATE | [2008/12] | French: | CONCENTRE DE SUSPENSION D'HUILE | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | IE | 14.10.2009 | LT | 14.10.2009 | LV | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | IS | 14.02.2010 | LU | 13.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/37] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | EE | 14.10.2009 | |
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | EE | 14.10.2009 | |
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | LT | 14.10.2009 | |
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0313317 (ISHIHARA MINING & CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, line 20 - line 36 * * page 3, line 7 - line 12 * * page 3, line 16 * * examples 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0645386 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 14 * * page 15, line 42 - line 44 * * page 16, line 17 - line 19 * * page 16, line 42 - line 45 * * table 1 *; | [DY]US5476936 (PHILIPP ULRICH [DE], et al) [DY] 1-16; | [Y]EP0764404 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP]) [Y] 16 * page 2, line 5 - line 7 * * page 2, line 46 - line 50 *; | [Y]WO9720467 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 16* page 2, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]WO0025586 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *; | [Y]WO0130155 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6-15 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 13 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 6 * * page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 20, paragraph 6 - page 24, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]WO0130156 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 18, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 1 - page 22, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]WO0182693 (AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 16 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 6, line 3 - page 14, line 2 * * page 16, paragraph 3 * * page 19, paragraph 4 - page 20, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]EP1277405 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP]) [Y] 16 * paragraph [0011] *; | [XY]WO2005011382 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [XY] 1,3-16 * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 1, line 23 - line 25 * * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 12 - line 23 * * page 5, line 14 - page 6, line 18 * * page 15, line 13 - line 17 * * page 21, line 10 - page 30, line 2 * * page 30, line 9 - line 27 * * page 31, line 1 - page 34, line 23 * * page 74, line 10 - page 76, line 3 * [Y] 16,2; | [Y]WO2005011378 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 18 - line 29 * * page 2, line 4 - line 10 * * page 3, line 11 - page 9, line 3 * * page 20, line 11 - line 14 * * page 30, line 7 - line 11 * * page 36, line 9 - page 42, line 26 * * page 44, line 12 - line 19 * * page 45, line 7 - line 15 * * page 50, line 3 - line 27 * |