EP1882266 - DIRECT COOLING OF AN AMALGAM RESERVOIR IN A LOW-PRESSURE MERCURY AMALGAM LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Noblelight GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [2008/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VORONOV, Alexei In den Türkischen Gärten 15 63450 Hanau / DE | 02 /
ARNOLD, Erich Wedekindstrasse 50 55127 Mainz / DE | 03 /
ROTH, Erik Querstrasse 2 63674 Altenstadt / DE | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Heraeus IP Heraeus Business Solutions GmbH Intellectual Property Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2008/05] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 06753735.7 | 19.05.2006 | [2008/05] | WO2006EP04754 | Priority number, date | DE20051023940 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: DE102005023940 | [2008/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006122818 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1882266 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/52, H01J61/72, H01J61/28, H01J61/34 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
H01J61/72 (EP,US);
H01J61/34 (EP,US);
H01J61/523 (EP,US);
H01J9/247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIREKTKÜHLUNG EINES AMALGAMDEPOTS IN EINEM QUECKSILBER-NIEDERDRUCK-AMALGAMSTRAHLER | [2008/05] | English: | DIRECT COOLING OF AN AMALGAM RESERVOIR IN A LOW-PRESSURE MERCURY AMALGAM LAMP | [2008/05] | French: | REFROIDISSEMENT DIRECT D'UN DEPOT D'AMALGAME DANS UN PROJECTEUR A AMALGAME DE MERCURE A BASSE PRESSION | [2008/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 18.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9631902 (WEDECO UMWELTTECHNOLOGIE WASSER BODEN LUFT GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1,4-6 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 2; figures 4-6 *; | [DX]DE10201617 (WEDECO AG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0018] - [0025]; figures 1,2a,2b *; | [I]DE1852479U (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [I] 4 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1; figures 2-5 *; | [T]US2006158091 (JIANG JACK [US]) [T] * table 1 *; | [A]EP1308217 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [A] * paragraph [0040] * |