EP1904419 - USE OF AN ORGANIC ADDITIVE FOR PRODUCING POROUS CONCRETE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Construction Research and Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STURM, Bernhard Jahnstrasse 9 83349 Palling / DE | 02 /
WUTZ, Konrad Herzog-Ludwig-Strasse 77 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06754731.5 | 17.07.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006EP07024 | Priority number, date | DE20051033454 | 18.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005033454 | [2008/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007009732 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1904419 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/02 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
C04B38/02 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/02, C04B7/02, C04B11/05, C04B14/06, C04B18/08, C04B22/04, C04B24/223, C04B24/226, C04B24/2647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES ORGANISCHEN ADDITIVS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PORENBETON | [2008/14] | English: | USE OF AN ORGANIC ADDITIVE FOR PRODUCING POROUS CONCRETE | [2008/14] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN ADDITIF ORGANIQUE DESTINE A LA PRODUCTION DE BETON ALVEOLE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]RU2073661 ; | [XY]JPH07187743 ; | [XY]JPH0710652 ; | [X]RU2063936 ; | JPS61205649 [ ] (UBE INDUSTRIES); | JPS6360175 [ ] (ONODA ALC KK); | JPH0323247 [ ] (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | JPH0710652 [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | JPH07187743 [ ] (KAO CORP); | [DY]DE19926611 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) [DY] 1-6 * page 2, line 1 - line 14 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 39, Database accession no. 1997-423421, XP002415040 & RU2073661 C1 19970220 (YAKUT DIAMONDS MINING IND RES INST) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 1-6 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 38, Database accession no. 1995-290090, XP002415041 & JPH07187743 A 19950725 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 1-6 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 12, Database accession no. 1995-085251, XP002415042 & JPH0710652 A 19950113 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 1-6 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 13, Database accession no. 1997-143970, XP002415043 & RU2063936 C1 19960720 (PATENT PRIZ CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - MINAMI, A., "Grout compositions", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870406), vol. 106, no. 14, Database accession no. 107081m, page 316, XP000061543 [X] 1-6 * column A * | [X] - ETO, K., "Shrinkage resistant lightweight mortar with high early strength", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880808), vol. 109, no. 6, Database accession no. 42688e, page 315, XP000055424 [X] 1-6 * column A * | [X] - TERAMURA, S., "Admixture for grouts", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910812), vol. 115, no. 6, Database accession no. 55739w, page 385, XP000251205 [X] 1-6 * column A * |