EP1878163 - WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Connect Spot Ltd Wasing Pavilion, Wasing Lane Aldermaston Reading, Berkshire RG6 4LY / GB | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Mark Ian, Connect Spot Ltd Wasing Pavilion,Wasing Lane Aldermaston, Reading Berkshire RG7 4LY / GB | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Spaargaren, Jerome Electronic Intellectual Property Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Spaargaren, Jerome Electronic Intellectual Property, Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06754779.4 | 20.04.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006EP61722 | Priority number, date | GB20050007988 | 20.04.2005 Original published format: GB 0507988 | GB20050013548 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0513548 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006111569 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878163 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
H04L63/101 (EP);
H04L63/108 (EP);
H04W12/068 (EP);
H04L63/083 (EP);
H04W12/08 (EP);
H04W8/26 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME FÜR DRAHTLOSEN ZUGANG | [2008/03] | English: | WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEMS | [2008/03] | French: | SYSTEMES D'ACCES SANS FIL | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004181602 (FINK IAN M [US]) [X] 1-18 * page 2, paragraph 33 * * page 3, paragraph 40 - paragraph 42 * * page 3, paragraph 45 - paragraph 46 * * page 4, paragraph 56 * * page 5, paragraph 59 - page 7, paragraph 78 * * page 8, paragraph 89 *; | [X]US6571221 (STEWART BRETT B [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 8 * * column 9, line 22 - column 12, line 32 * * column 15, line 37 - line 53 * * column 17, line 3 - line 35 *; | [X]EP1117266 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * |