EP1874738 - PYRIMIDINES REACTING WITH O6-ALKYLGUANINE-DNA ALKYLTRANSFERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covalys Biosciences AG Benkenstrasse 254 4108 Witterswil / CH | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINDERMANN, Maik Diesterwegstrasse 31 60594 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
SCHWAB, Markus Schlossstrasse 32 79541 Lörrach / DE | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Austrasse 24 4051 Basel / CH | [2016/26] |
Former [2014/43] | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Austrasse 24 4051 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/02] | Becker, Konrad Aeschenvorstadt 24 Postfach 318 4010 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06754825.5 | 25.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006EP61798 | Priority number, date | EP20050103477 | 27.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05103477 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006114409 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874738 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874738 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/46 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C07D239/47 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MIT O6-ALKYLGUANIN-DNA-ALKYLTRANSFERASE REAGIERENDE PYRIMIDINE | [2008/02] | English: | PYRIMIDINES REACTING WITH O6-ALKYLGUANINE-DNA ALKYLTRANSFERASE | [2008/02] | French: | PYRIMIDINES REAGISSANT AVEC LES O6-ALKYLGUANINE-ADN ALKYLTRANSFERASES | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2006 | AT | 29.06.2016 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | ES | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | SE | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.04.2006 | |
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.04.2006 | |
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9720843 (CANCER RES CAMPAIGN TECH [GB], et al) [DY] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9604281 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 13 - page 2, line 32; claims 5,21 *; | [DY]WO2004031405 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH], et al) [DY] 1-15 * claims 1,7,31 *; | [DY]WO02083937 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH], et al) [DY] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [PD]WO2005085470 (EPFL ECOLE POLYTECHNIQUE FEDERALE LAUSANNE [CH], et al) [PD] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - KEPPLER ANTJE ET AL, "A general method for the covalent labeling of fusion proteins with small molecules in vivo", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (20030120), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 86 - 89, XP002231034 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt765 |