EP1878014 - FILM FORMING PHOTOSENSITIVE MATERIALS FOR THE LIGHT INDUCED GENERATION OF OPTICAL ANISOTROPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAKREVSKYY, Yuriy Schwalbenhof 3 14476 Potsdam / DE | 02 /
FAUL, Charl 112 Hillside Road Bristol Bristol BS57PF / GB | 03 /
STUMPE, Joachim Florastrasse 21 Nauen 14641 / DE | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Olgemöller, Luitgard Maria, et al Patentanwältin Lindenstraße 12a 81545 München / DE | [2011/07] |
Former [2008/03] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06755029.3 | 04.05.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006EP62074 | Priority number, date | EP20050009865 | 05.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05009865 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006117403 | Date: | 09.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878014 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878014 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/25, G11B7/244 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G11B7/25 (EP,US);
G11B7/244 (EP,US);
G11B7/246 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24612 (EP,US);
G11B7/24044 (EP,US);
G11B7/245 (EP,US);
G11B7/2467 (EP,US);
G11B7/2475 (EP,US);
G11B7/2531 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/03] | G11B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILMBILDENDE LICHTEMPFINDLICHE MATERIALIEN ZUR LICHTINDUZIERTEN ERZEUGUNG OPTISCHER ANISOTROPIE | [2008/03] | English: | FILM FORMING PHOTOSENSITIVE MATERIALS FOR THE LIGHT INDUCED GENERATION OF OPTICAL ANISOTROPY | [2008/03] | French: | MATÉRIAUX FILMOGÈNES, PHOTOSENSIBLES, POUR LA GÉNÉRATION D'ANISOTROPIE OPTIQUE INTRODUIT PAR LA LUMIÈRE | [2010/01] |
Former [2008/03] | FILM FORMANT DES MATERIAUX PHOTOSENSIBLES POUR LA GENERATION INDUITE PAR LA LUMIERE D'UNE ANISOTROPIE OPTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 29.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0555793 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1,23,34,38 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 54 * * examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1385051 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [A] 1,23,34* claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2005025422 (MAGNUSSON ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1,23,34,38 * figures 9a,b; examples 1,2; claims 4,5 * |