EP1899561 - SYSTEM FOR A KEYLESS ACTIVATION OF A LOCKING DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [2010/30] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALKENBERG, Andreas Kettwiger Strasse 121 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Ulrich Schneegelskothen 7c 42549 Velbert / DE | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Andreas, et al Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Vogel, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel, Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 06755097.0 | 09.05.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006EP62155 | Priority number, date | DE20051030081 | 27.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005030081 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007000370 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1899561 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899561 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B60R25/246 (EP);
E05B81/78 (EP,KR);
B60R25/01 (KR);
B60R25/2009 (EP);
B60R25/2081 (EP);
B60R25/307 (EP);
E05B19/04 (KR);
E05B19/043 (EP);
E05B81/60 (KR);
G07C9/00857 (EP);
G07C9/00944 (EP);
B60R2325/101 (EP);
G07C2009/00507 (EP);
G07C2009/0088 (EP);
G07C2009/00992 (EP);
G07C2209/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR EINE SCHLÜSSELLOSE AKTIVIERUNG EINER SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2008/12] | English: | SYSTEM FOR A KEYLESS ACTIVATION OF A LOCKING DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2008/12] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'ACTIVER UN DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE SANS CLE | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | HU | 28.07.2010 | IE | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | LT | 28.07.2010 | |
NL | 28.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3900494 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,16,18-20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0846822 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,12-16,18-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2329668 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [Y] 8 * page 10, line 7 - line 26; figure 9 *; | [YA]US2003102957 (CRISP DAVID [GB]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050] * [A] 1,18; | [X]EP1363249 (TELECO AUTOMATION SRL [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,12-16,18-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004006707 (PRETZLAFF VOLKER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,12-20 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2004128065 (TAYLOR DAVID W [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0041] * [A] 1,18; | [A]WO2004077721 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US], et al) [A] 1,12-16,18 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] ** paragraph [0078] *; | [XY]US2004230348 (MANN TORSTEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,12-16,18-20 * the whole document * [Y] 8,10,11 |