EP1893585 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-[4-(4-FLUOROPHENYL)-5-FORMYL-6-ISOPROPYL-PYRIMIDIN-2-YL]-N-METHYLMETHANESULFONAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fermion Oy Koivu-Mankkaan tie 6 a FI-02200 Espoo / FI | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUMANN, Arne Siestankuja 13 A FI-02700 Kauniainen / FI | 02 /
PIETIKÄINEN, Pekka Aallonkohina 6 E 49 FI-02320 Espoo / FI | 03 /
REINE, Inese Grivas Str. 11/13-19 LV-1055 Riga / LV | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Sexton, Jane Helen J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06755392.5 | 31.05.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006FI00170 | Priority number, date | FI20050000586 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: FI 20050586 | US20050685890P | 01.06.2005 Original published format: US 685890 P | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006128954 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893585 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/30, C07D239/32 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP);
C07D239/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | AL | 04.12.2007 | BA | 04.12.2007 | HR | 04.12.2007 | MK | 04.12.2007 | YU | 04.12.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-[4-(4-FLUORPHENYL)-5-FORMYL-6-ISOPROPYLPYRIMIDIN-2-YL]-N-METHYLMETHANSULFONAMID | [2008/10] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-[4-(4-FLUOROPHENYL)-5-FORMYL-6-ISOPROPYL-PYRIMIDIN-2-YL]-N-METHYLMETHANESULFONAMIDE | [2008/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE N-[4-(4-FLUOROPHENYL)-5-FORMYL-6-ISOPROPYL-PYRIMIDIN-2-YL]-N-METHYLMETHANESULFONAMIDE | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03097614 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN]; KUMAR YATENDRA [IN]; DE SHANTANU [IN]; RAFEEQ MO) [AD] 1-21,1-21,1-21 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [AD]US5260440 (HIRAI KENTARO [JP] ET AL) [AD] 1-21,1-21,1-21 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004052867 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN]; KUMAR YATENDRA [IN]; MEERAN HASHIM NIZAR POOVANA) [A] 1-21,1-21,1-21 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]DE2310334 (GEROT PHARMAZEUTIKA) [A] 8,8,8 * claim 1 * * claim 1 * * claim 1 * | [A] - WATANABE M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF METHANESULFONAMIDE PYRIMIDINE-AND N-METHANESULFONYL PYRROLE-SUBSTITUTED 3,5-DIHYDROXY-6-HEPTENOATES, A NOVEL SERIES OF HMG-COA REDUCTASE INHIBITORS", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (1997), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 437 - 444, XP000882043 [A] 1-21,1-21,1-21 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(96)00248-9 |