EP1896781 - A REFLECTION HEATING FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abodreham, David 30 Hari Gilad St. 46228 Herzliya / IL | For all designated states Ben David, Jacob Room 2021a Renfeng Tower 490 TianHe Road TianHe dist, Guang zhou Guangdong 510630 / CN | For all designated states Mashiah, Nissim 17 Ben Gurion Street Or Yesuda / IL | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Starsun Platinum Limited Room 702, Easey Commercial Building Hennessy Road Hong Kong Wanchai 253-261 / CN | ||
For all designated states Abodreham, David 30 Hari Gilad St. 46228 Herzliya / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN- DAVID, Jacob room 2012A, RenFeng Tower, TianHe Road Guangzhou, Guangdong 510630 / CN | 02 /
Abodreham David 30 Hari Gilad Str. 46228 Herzliya / IL | [2008/33] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
BEN- DAVID, Jacob 1079w 18th St. San Pedro, CA 90731 / US | ||
02 /
Abodreham David 30 Hari Gilad Str. 46228 Herzliya / IL | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2009/38] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario di Maurizio Sarpi Via Collina 36 00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2008/11] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio FERRARIO Via Collina, 36 I-00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 06756180.3 | 29.05.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006IL00628 | Priority number, date | IL20050169459 | 29.06.2005 Original published format: IL 16945905 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007000752 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1896781 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24H3/04 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
F24H3/0411 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFLEXIONSHEIZLÜFTER | [2008/11] | English: | A REFLECTION HEATING FAN | [2008/11] | French: | VENTILATEUR CHAUFFANT A REFLECTEUR | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2334501 (MOELLER GEORGE L) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8; | [X]GB699230 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [X] 1,4,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US4835367 (HOFFMAN ERICH [DE]) [X] 1-3,9 * abstract *; | [X]US6160956 (PELONIS KOSTA L [US]) [X] 1,6 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004218912 (SHAPIRO BARRY [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0070] *; | [Y]JPS56102636 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 7 * abstract * |