EP1904975 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACTIVE DETECTION OF ASYMMETRY IN ROTATING STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNION RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION, LTD. Senate House, Technion City Haifa 32000 / IL | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOMER, Ofer 28 Soroka 34759 Haifa / IL | 02 /
BUCHER, Izhak 6 Boaz St. 34487 Haifa / IL | [2010/24] |
Former [2008/14] | 01 /
SHOMER, Ofer 6 Boaz St. 34487 Haifa / IL | ||
02 /
BUCHER, Izhak 28 Soroka t. 34759 Haifa / IL | Representative(s) | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 16 Upper Woburn Place London WC1H 0BS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer UK LLP 15 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EF / GB | ||
Former [2008/14] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06756253.8 | 12.07.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006IL00811 | Priority number, date | US20050698022P | 12.07.2005 Original published format: US 698022 P | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007007333 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1904975 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/16, G01M1/00 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G01M1/20 (EP,US);
F03D17/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | G06T7/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKTIVEN DETEKTION VON ASYMMETRIE IN ROTIERENDEN STRUKTUREN | [2008/14] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACTIVE DETECTION OF ASYMMETRY IN ROTATING STRUCTURES | [2008/14] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION ACTIVE D'ASYMETRIE DANS DES STRUCTURES ROTATIVES | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 28.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3141338 (HEINRICH HACK) [X] 1,5 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 32 * * claims 1-7 * [I] 2-4,6-12; | [A]US6809449 (SHINOZAKI HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]US6840104 (TAMURA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6871543 (ROTHAMEL KARL [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 4, lines 5-65 * | International search | [X]US6872543 (SIPPONEN PENTTI [FI], et al); | [Y]US6840104 (TAMURA EIJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US6809449 (SHINOZAKI HIROYUKI [JP]); | [A]US6826959 (MIN KYOUNG-SEO [KR]); | [A]US6779400 (THELEN DIETER [DE], et al); | [A]US5138882 (HUMBER KURT [DE], et al) | by applicant | US3141338 | US6871543 | US6840104 | US6809449 | - BUCHER; SEIBOLD, "A two-stage approach for enhanced diagnosis of rotating machines", IFTOMM CONFERENCE ON ROTOR DYNAMICS, (199809), pages 338 - 349 |