EP1944116 - CLADDING MATERIAL AND ITS FABRICATION METHOD, METHOD FOR MOLDING CLADDING MATERIAL, AND HEAT SINK USING CLADDING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsushima, Eiki 221, Kawanarishinmachi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-0955 / JP | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Steffen Kayser & Möbus Patentanwälte Muenchstrasse 3 86482 Aystetten / DE | [2012/31] |
Former [N/P] | Möbus, Steffen Streitbörger Speckmann Patentanwälte Kayser & Möbus Leienfelsstrasse 6 81243 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Möbus, Steffen Leienfelsstrasse 6 81243 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06756591.1 | 25.05.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006JP310441 | Priority number, date | JP20050302590 | 18.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005302590 | [2008/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007046164 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1944116 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1944116 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/00, H01L23/373, B23K20/02, B23K20/04, B30B11/02, B32B15/01 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
B23K20/00 (KR);
B23K20/02 (EP,US);
B23K20/04 (EP,US);
B23K20/22 (KR);
B32B15/01 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/018 (EP,US);
H01L23/373 (KR);
B23K2101/18 (EP,US);
B23K2101/36 (EP,US);
B23K2103/08 (EP,US);
B23K2103/12 (EP,US);
B23K2103/18 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12632 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | B23K20/00, H01L23/373 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | VERKLEIDUNGSMATERIAL UND SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERKLEIDUNGSMATERIAL UND VERKLEIDUNGSMATERIAL VERWENDENDE WÄRMESENKE | [2008/29] | English: | CLADDING MATERIAL AND ITS FABRICATION METHOD, METHOD FOR MOLDING CLADDING MATERIAL, AND HEAT SINK USING CLADDING MATERIAL | [2008/29] | French: | MATERIAU DE GAINE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION, PROCEDE POUR MOULER UN MATERIAU DE GAINE ET DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE UTILISANT LEDIT MATERIAU | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2008 | Translation filed | 16.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2006 | BE | 01.08.2012 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | IT | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | MC | 01.08.2012 | NL | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | TR | 01.08.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | BE | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 01.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4025997 (GERNITIS JEFFREY, et al) [A] 1,8,10 * table 1 *; | [XY]JPS60239033 (TOKYO TUNGSTEN KK) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,11 * abstract * [Y] 10; | [YA]US4950554 (FUSCO RONALD S [US]) [Y] 2 * column 2, lines 19-46 * * column 3, lines 10-27; claim 4 * [A] 8,9; | [A]JPH03218054 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,2,4* abstract *; | [X]US5156923 (JHA SUNIL C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,11 * column 3, lines 4-39; figure - *; | [Y]JPH0647443 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [Y]US6129993 (KUMAMOTO SHINGO [JP], et al) [Y] 8,9 * column 7, lines 54-67 * * column 9, line 20 - column 11, line 17; table 1 *; | [Y]JP2000286358 (AIDA ENG LTD) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2004249589 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,3-7,11 * abstract * [Y] 2,8-10; | [XPA]WO2006050205 (STARCK H C INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-7,11 * page 7, lines 26-29 * * page 10, lines 19,20; figure -; example - * [AP] 8-10 |