EP1890014 - EXHAUST EMISSION CONTROL METHOD AND EXHAUST EMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1 Minami-ohi 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8722 / JP | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAITO, Kenta, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu-takase-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158686 / JP | 02 /
SENBAYASHI, Satoru, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu-takase-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158686 / JP | 03 /
HAMADA, Yuichi, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu-takase-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158686 / JP | 04 /
KASAI, Junichi c/o Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1, Minami-Oi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 1408722 / JP | 05 /
TAMURA, Yoshinobu, Isuzu Motors Limited, Fujisawa Factory 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2528501 / JP | 06 /
GABE, Masashi Isuzu Motors Limited, Fujisawa Fact. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2528501 / JP | [2012/19] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
NAITO, Kenta, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu-takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158686 / JP | ||
02 /
SENBAYASHI, Satoru, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 44, Umezu-takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158586 / JP | |||
03 /
HAMADA, Yuichi, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu-takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158686 / JP | |||
04 /
KASAI, Junichi c/o Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1, Minami-Oi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 1408722 / JP | |||
05 /
TAMURA, Y., Isuzu Motors Limited, Fujisawa Factory 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2528501 / JP | |||
06 /
GABE, Masashi Isuzu Motors Limited, Fujisawa Fact. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2528501 / JP | |||
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
NAITO, Kenta, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu-takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158686 / JP | ||
02 /
SENBAYASHI, Satoru, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 44, Umezu-takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158586 / JP | |||
03 /
HAMADA, Yuichi, Nissin Electric Co., Ltd. 47, Umezu-takase-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 6158686 / JP | |||
04 /
KASAI, Junichi Isuzu Motors Limited Fujisawa Fact. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2528501 / JP | |||
05 /
TAMURA, Y., Isuzu Motors Limited, Fujisawa Factory 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2528501 / JP | |||
06 /
GABE, Masashi Isuzu Motors Limited, Fujisawa Fact. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 2528501 / JP | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | WSL Patentanwälte Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Seiffert, Klaus, et al Patentanwälte Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06756703.2 | 30.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006JP310707 | Priority number, date | JP20050168317 | 08.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005168317 | [2008/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006132103 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1890014 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890014 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/32, F01N3/027, F01N3/20 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
F01N3/2086 (EP,US);
F01N3/02 (KR);
B01D39/20 (KR);
B01D53/323 (EP,US);
B01D53/94 (KR);
F01N3/0275 (EP,US);
F01N3/24 (KR);
B01D2258/012 (EP,US);
B01D2259/818 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | F01N3/02, B01D39/20, B01D53/94, F01N3/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/29] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSVERFAHREN UND ABGASREINIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2008/08] | English: | EXHAUST EMISSION CONTROL METHOD AND EXHAUST EMISSION CONTROL SYSTEM | [2008/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉDUCTION DES ÉMISSIONS DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2007 | Translation filed | 15.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 09.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.09.2012 | [2013/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1460244 (PERKINS ENGINES CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0040] - [0084] * * figures 3-21 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US2005063879 (TSUJI KIMITOSHI [JP]) [Y] 6* figures 1,6 * |