EP1886355 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSURUME, Takuya SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO. LTD., 398 Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | 02 /
HORIKOSHI, Nozomi SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO.,LTD, 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06756864.2 | 25.05.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006JP310945 | Priority number, date | JP20050159633 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005159633 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006129741 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886355 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/786, H01L21/336, H01L27/12 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
H01L27/1266 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/78603 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/12 (KR);
H01L27/1214 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/78645 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/07] | H01L29/786, H01L21/336 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2008/27] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2008/07] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2008/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2001038428 (LEE JAE-GU [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * abstract * * figures 4,6A-6d * * paragraphs [0017] , [0023] , [0040] - [0045] * [I] 3-6,10-14; | [XI]US2002158573 (KOBASHI YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-9,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0016] , [0030] , [0081] - [0092]; figures 2,4,5,6 * [I] 3-6,10,11,13,14; | [XI]US2003080436 (ISHIKAWA AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * figures 3B-3E,9A-9C,10,11A,12A *[I] 3-6,10-14 |