EP1898351 - ELECTRONIC ADVERTISEMENT SYSTEM AND ITS DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATTORI, Yasuyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | 02 /
MAEKAWA, Takuji c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 1410001 / JP | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06757263.6 | 12.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006JP311778 | Priority number, date | JP20050183953 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005183953 | [2008/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006137284 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1898351 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06F13/00, G06K17/00, G09F19/00 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
G09F27/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,KR,US);
G06K17/0022 (EP,US);
G09F9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/40] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES WERBUNGSSYSTEM UND ANZEIGESTEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/11] | English: | ELECTRONIC ADVERTISEMENT SYSTEM AND ITS DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD | [2008/11] | French: | SYSTEME PUBLICITAIRE ELECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2007 | Translation filed | 14.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 20.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2013 | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/39] | 20.05.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 07.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0171530 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 15 *; | [I]US2002120498 (GORDON DONALD F [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0054] *; | [I]US2004147265 (KELLEY MARK [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0054] *; | [I]US2005005242 (HOYLE MARTIN DAVID [US]) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0137] *; | [I]US2005033771 (SCHMITTER THOMAS A [US], et al) [I] 1-4* the whole document * | Examination | US5956046 | US2003078077 |