EP1892786 - METHANOL FUEL CELL CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Kaisha, Ltd. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8522 / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku tokyo 1058001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Kaisha, Ltd. 3-1, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8522 / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku tokyo 1058001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMODA, Daisuke c/o TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA, LTD. 1-1-70 YakoTsurumi-ku Technology & Packaging Development Division Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 02 /
YOSHINO, Kyoko c/o TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA, LTD. 1-1-70, Yako Tsurumi-ku Technology & Packaging Development Division Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0001 / JP | 03 /
TAKIZAWA, Yumiko, K. K. TOSHIBA Yokohama Complex 8 Shinsugita-cho Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP | [2012/03] |
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
IMODA, Daisuke, TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA, LTD. 1-1-70, yako, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0047 / JP | ||
02 /
YOSHINO, Kyoko, TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA, LTD. 1-1-70, yako, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0047 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKIZAWA, Yumiko, K. K. TOSHIBA Yokohama Complex, 8 Shinsugita-cho, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/04] |
Former [2008/09] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06757272.7 | 13.06.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006JP311787 | Priority number, date | JP20050177376 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005177376 | [2008/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006134889 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892786 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1892786 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, // H01M8/10 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
H01M8/04208 (EP,US);
H01M8/00 (US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/09] | H01M8/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/35] |
Former [2008/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | METHANOLBRENNSTOFFZELLENKASSETTE | [2008/09] | English: | METHANOL FUEL CELL CARTRIDGE | [2008/09] | French: | CARTOUCHE POUR PILE À COMBUSTIBLE AU MÉTHANOL | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2007 | Translation filed | 20.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/21] | GB | 13.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004126643 (KINKELAAR MARK R [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0118] * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2005004268 (TOKAI CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2005116190 (ADAMS PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0035] * * claims 1,16-23,48,49 *; | [XPA]JP2005317250 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO, et al) [XP] 1,2,6 * abstract * [A] 3-5,7; | [XPA]JP2006127893 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO) [XP] 1,2,6 * abstract * [A] 3-5,7; | [E]US2006151494 (NAKAMURA YASUAKI [JP], et al) [E] 1-7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] ** claims 1-5 * |