26.04.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
08.03.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
18.05.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
18.05.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
15.05.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.05.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
04.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
13.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2011 |
First examination report |
|
27.04.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.09.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
03.09.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
08.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
07.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
06.06.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
03.06.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
13.02.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.01.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
18.01.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
11.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|